HI SB2967 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Mandates that fifty per cent of all heavy-duty motor vehicles in the State's fleet be hydrogen or battery electric vehicles by an unspecified date. Mandates that one hundred per cent of all heavy-duty motor vehicles in the State's fleet be hydrogen or battery electric vehicles by December 31, 2035. Defines heavy-duty motor vehicle and hydrogen vehicle. (SD1)
Title
Relating To State Vehicles.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/WAM. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from TCA/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2592) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/WAM. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, DeCoite, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Richards. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Elefante ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Referred to TCA/AEN, CPN/WAM. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1995 (Same As) 2024-01-24 - Referred to EEP/TRN, FIN, referral sheet 2
Subjects
Battery Electric Vehicles
Department of Transportation
Heavy-Duty Motor Vehicles
Hydrogen Motor Vehicles
State Fleet
Zero Emissions
Department of Transportation
Heavy-Duty Motor Vehicles
Hydrogen Motor Vehicles
State Fleet
Zero Emissions