HI SB2969 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) LoPresti voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Matsumoto, Quinlan, Thielen, Tupola, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) LoPresti voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Matsumoto, Quinlan, Thielen, Tupola, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes the reconstruction or alteration of certain existing single-family residences from the definition of "development" for purposes of the special management areas law. Authorizes county planning authorities to further define new single-family residence construction Requires the county authorities to consider sea level rise when reviewing and approving all developments. (SB2969 HD1)
Title
Relating To Special Management Areas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) LoPresti voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Matsumoto, Quinlan, Thielen, Tupola, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from WAL/HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1353-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-20 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Aquino, Hashem, Quinlan, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-03-20 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Cullen, Kong, Lowen, McKelvey; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2018-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/HSG on Tuesday, 03-20-18 11:20AM in House conference room 423. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to WAL/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 376) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2748) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Inouye, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, L. Thielen. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-28-18 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WTL. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2190) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WTL. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Harimoto, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Nishihara. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-18 2:55PM in conference room 225. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to HOU, WTL. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |