HI SB2969 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to HOU, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to HOU, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Temporarily exempts affordable housing projects from all state fees related to discretionary approval or ministerial permitting. Sunsets on 1/1/2032.
Title
Relating To Affordable Housing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HOU, JDC/WAM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2447 (Same As) 2020-05-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2969&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2969_.HTM |