HI SB2976 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Transfers administration of the licensing and regulation program for private trade, vocational, and technical schools from the Department of Education to the Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs. (SB2976 HD1)
Title
Private Trade, Vocational, and Technical Schools; Department of Education; Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6). |
2016-03-24 | House | Reported from EDN/CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1229-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-03-21 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Nakashima, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Kawakami, C. Lee, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang. |
2016-03-21 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Aquino, Choy, Ichiyama, Say, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matsumoto, Tupola; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Ito, Kong. |
2016-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN/CPC on Monday, 03-21-16 2:10PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to EDN/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 319) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2746) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Galuteria, Taniguchi, Wakai. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-16 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Reported from EDU/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2444) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-16 12:30PM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Referred to EDU/CPH, WAM. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2454 (Same As) 2016-02-17 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.