HI SB2989 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-10 - The committee on WLA deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Water, Land, and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-10 - The committee on WLA deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Water, Land, and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires farmers market vendors that direct-market potentially hazardous value added products to obtain a permit from the Department of Health. Exempts non-potentially hazardous value added products from Department of Health permitting or inspection. Establishes labeling requirements for value added products sold at farmers markets.
Title
Farmers Market Vendors; Permit and Inspection; Labeling
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-10 | Senate | The committee on WLA deferred the measure. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-16 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Referred to WLA, CPH. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2989&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB2989_.HTM |