HI SB2989 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-18 2:30PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-18 2:30PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands eligibility and credit amount of the low-income household renters' income tax credit and adjusts the credit for inflation. Appropriates funds for the Family Assessment Center. Establishes and appropriates funds for the Homeless Children Rental Assistance Pilot Program and permits the Hawaii Public Housing Authority to procure certain services outside the state procurement process for the pilot program. (SB2989 HD1)
Title
Relating To Homelessness.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-18 2:30PM in conference room 325. |
2018-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 788). |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Espero Chair; Green, Riviere Co-Chairs. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Brower, Mizuno, Luke Co-Chairs; Gates, Nakamura, McDermott. |
2018-04-06 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 574). |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 474). |
2018-04-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Holt, C. Lee, LoPresti, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (6). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1862-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-03-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2018-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-28-18 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from HSG/HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1385-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-20 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-03-20 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Aquino, Hashem, Quinlan, San Buenaventura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-20-18 11:00AM in conference room 423. |
2018-03-16 | House | The committee(s) on HSG/HHS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-20-18. |
2018-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/HHS on Friday, 03-16-18 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to HSG/HHS, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 381) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2670) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-18 10:10AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Reported from HOU/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2507) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Harimoto, K. Kahele; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Nishihara. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU deferred the measure until 02-15-18 2:55PM in conference room 225. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-18 3:30PM in conference room 016. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to HOU/HMS, WAM. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2751 (Same As) 2018-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
Subjects
Appropriation
Family Assessment Center
Housing Homeless Children Rental Assistance Pilot Program
Low-Income Household Renters' Income Tax Credit
Family Assessment Center
Housing Homeless Children Rental Assistance Pilot Program
Low-Income Household Renters' Income Tax Credit