HI SB2990 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-08 - (H) Referred to WLO, HED, FIN, referral sheet 41
Pending: House Water, Land, & Ocean Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-08 - (H) Referred to WLO, HED, FIN, referral sheet 41
Pending: House Water, Land, & Ocean Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DAGS to hire an independent third party to develop a long-range plan for Aloha stadium, including a feasibility study to determine the cost benefits of placing Aloha stadium under the jurisdiction of UH rather than DAGS; requires a report to 2013 legislature; appropriates funds from the stadium special fund. (SD2)
Title
Aloha Stadium; UH; DAGS; Stadium Special Fund; Appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to WLO, HED, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 382) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 20; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Baker, Dela Cruz, Espero, Green, Ihara, Nishihara, Wakai . Noes, 5 (Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Kim, Slom, Solomon, Taniguchi). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2609) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2012-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, English, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kouchi, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Espero, Kim, Ryan ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Slom; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-12 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Reported from EDT/EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2366) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2012-02-13 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Taniguchi; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-02-13 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Solomon, Slom; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT/EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-12 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) Referred to EDT/EDU, WAM. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |