HI SB2990 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - The committee on HRE deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - The committee on HRE deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the usage of supplemental nutrition assistance program benefits by means of electronic benefits transfer cards in all cafeterias in four-year university and community college campuses in the University of Hawaii system.
Title
Relating To The University Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee on HRE deferred the measure. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-20 3:10PM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Electronic Benefits Transfer Cards
Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program
University of Hawaii
Usage Allowed
Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program
University of Hawaii
Usage Allowed
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2990&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2990_.HTM |