HI SB2999 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-24 - Referred to AEN/HTH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-24 - Referred to AEN/HTH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits composting and co-composting operations in agricultural districts. Appropriates funds to restore an environmental health specialist IV position to the solid and hazardous waste branch of the department of health.
Title
Relating To The Environment.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Laura Acasio [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AEN/HTH, WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1992 (Same As) 2022-06-27 - Act 131, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1232).
Subjects
Agricultural Districts
Appropriation ($)
Co-Composting
Composting
Environmental Health Specialist IV
Permitted Uses
Appropriation ($)
Co-Composting
Composting
Environmental Health Specialist IV
Permitted Uses
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2999&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB2999_.HTM |