HI SB3000 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-24 - Referred to AEN, CPN.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-24 - Referred to AEN, CPN.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Beginning July 1, 2023, bans the manufacture, sale, distribution, and use of wraps and liners, plates, food boats, pizza boxes, and firefighting foams that contain perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances (PFAS).
Title
Relating To Environmental Protection.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AEN, CPN. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1644 (Same As) 2022-06-27 - Act 152, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1253).
Subjects
Ban
Department of Health
Fines
Firefighting Foam
Food Packaging
Perfluoroalkyl and Polyfluoroalkyl Substances
Department of Health
Fines
Firefighting Foam
Food Packaging
Perfluoroalkyl and Polyfluoroalkyl Substances
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=3000&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB3000_.HTM |