HI SB3013 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM/CPN.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM/CPN.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the Department of Transportation for the coordinated removal of albizia and other invasive trees. Requires matching funds from public utilities.
Title
Relating To Invasive Species.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM/CPN. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from TCA/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2593) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM/CPN. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Richards. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Elefante, Kanuha, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Referred to TCA/AEN, WAM/CPN. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2650 (Same As) 2024-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM/CPN.
Subjects
Albizia Trees
Appropriation
Department of Transportation
Expenditure Ceiling ($)
Invasive Species
Public Utilities
Removal
Appropriation
Department of Transportation
Expenditure Ceiling ($)
Invasive Species
Public Utilities
Removal