HI SB3019 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Land and Natural Resources to pursue and obtain accreditation for the Conservation and Resources Enforcement Program from the Commission on Accreditation for Law Enforcement Agencies, Inc. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Conservation And Resources Enforcement Program.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729). |
2022-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Lowen, Tarnas, Marten Co-Chairs; Tokioka, Matsumoto. |
2022-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 871). |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 675). |
2022-04-12 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1964-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-04-05 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Perruso, McDermott. |
2022-04-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-05-22 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Quinlan excused (2). |
2022-03-24 | House | Reported from EEP/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1305-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-03-22 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kong, McDermott. |
2022-03-22 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi. |
2022-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/WAL on Tuesday, 03-22-22 9:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-11 | House | Re-referred to EEP/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 25 |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 406) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3134) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2093) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Accreditation
Appropriation ($)
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Division of Conservation and Resources Enforcement
Law Enforcement
Appropriation ($)
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Division of Conservation and Resources Enforcement
Law Enforcement