HI SB3028 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-08 - (H) Referred to WLO, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 41
Pending: House Water, Land, & Ocean Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-08 - (H) Referred to WLO, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 41
Pending: House Water, Land, & Ocean Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes DLNR policies regarding sandalwood and designates sandalwood as a native forest resource in need of conservation. Requires a harvest permit for commercial harvesting of native forest resources. Establishes penalties for the destruction or harvesting of sandalwood trees. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Sandalwood; DLNR
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to WLO, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 397) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2809) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2012-02-28 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Dela Cruz, Kahele, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. | |
2012-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-12 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Reported from WLH/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2394) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2012-02-16 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Fukunaga, Ryan, Shimabukuro, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-02-16 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) The committee on JDL has rescheduled its decision making to 02-16-12 4:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-16-12 4:00PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH deferred the measure until 02-16-12 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-12 10:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) Referred to WLH/JDL, WAM. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |