HI SB3031 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-26 - Referred to PSM, JDC.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-26 - Referred to PSM, JDC.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits carrying or using a firearm in the commission of a separate misdemeanor offense. Amends and clarifies prohibitions regarding deadly or dangerous weapons, regarding switchblade knives, and regarding butterfly knives.
Title
Relating To Weapons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-26 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2342 (Same As) 2024-05-13 - Act 021, 05/13/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1121).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=3031&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB3031_.HTM |