HI SB304 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires each county to issue affordable housing credits for each single-family residence, multi-family unit, other residential unit, or if allowed by the county, vacant lot, developed by the Hawaii public housing authority under specified conditions and requirements. Repeals on June 30, 2015.
Title
Affordable Housing Credits; Hawaii Public Housing Authority; Counties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-07 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | The committee on HMS deferred the measure. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-13 1:00PM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HMS/PSM, WAM. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=304&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB304_.HTM |