HI SB3053 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-08 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-08 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the conveyance tax rate for certain properties. Exempts conveyances of certain real property from the conveyance tax. Eliminates the cap on the amount of conveyance tax collections allocated to the land conservation fund and rental housing revolving fund. Allocates ten percent of conveyance tax collections to the Dwelling Unit Revolving Fund for the purpose of funding infrastructure programs in transit-oriented development areas.
Title
Relating To The Conveyance Tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | The committee on HOU deferred the measure. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/HOU deferred the measure until 02-08-24 1:00PM; CR 225. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Referred to WTL/HOU, WAM. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2364 (Same As) 2024-03-18 - The committee(s) on HOU/WTL deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-19-24 1:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
Subjects
Allocations
Conveyance Tax Rates and Exemptions
Dwelling Unit Revolving Fund
Land Conservation Fund
Rental Housing Revolving Fund
Conveyance Tax Rates and Exemptions
Dwelling Unit Revolving Fund
Land Conservation Fund
Rental Housing Revolving Fund
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=3053&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB3053_.HTM |