HI SB306 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health insurance coverage of orthodontic treatment for orofacial anomalies.
Title
Health Insurance; Orthodontic Treatment; Orofacial Anomalies
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reported from HTH/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 205) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Kidani, Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Wakai, Baker, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-15 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Referred to HTH/CPN, WAM. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB174 (Same As) 2015-07-06 - Act 213, 07/02/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1314).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=306&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SB306_.HTM |