HI SB3069 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-15 - (S) The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-15 - (S) The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows citizens to bring suit against a person or party in violation of land uses permissible in the use classification districts established by the land use commission. Establishes authority and discretion for the land use commission to enforce the use classification districts adopted and the restrictions and conditions on land use under chapter 205, Hawaii Revised Statutes. Allows land use commission to designate an enforcement officer or agency to act on its behalf in enforcement proceedings. Establishes administrative fines for violations.
Title
Land Use Commission; Restriction on Use; Condition; Enforcement
Sponsors
Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-15 | (S) The committee on JDL deferred the measure. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) The committee on WLH deferred the measure. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) The committee on PGM deferred the measure. | |
2012-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH/PGM/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-12 10:50AM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) Referred to WLH/PGM/JDL, WAM. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=3069 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB3069_.HTM |