HI SB307 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB307
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the School Facilities Authority of the Department of Education to disregard any ordinance or rule related to the use, zoning, planning, or development of land to which the authority holds title or for any construction on land to which the authority holds title.
Title
Relating To The School Facilities Authority.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to EDU/WTL, JDC/WAM. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to EDU/WTL, JDC. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB307 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - Re-Referred to EDU/WTL, JDC/WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=307&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB307_.HTM |