HI SB3081 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-28 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-28 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an innovative business interaction program under the Hawaii tourism authority. Increases the transient accommodations tax revenues deposited into the tourism special fund for expenditures for the program. Effective July 1, 2050. (SB3081 HD1)
Title
Innovative Business Interaction Program; Establishment; Hawaii Tourism Authority; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Ronald Kouchi [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-28 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-03-27 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-28-14 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3). |
2014-03-21 | House | Reported from TOU/EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1140-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-03-17 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Ward, Brower, Cachola, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Wooley; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Awana, Ito, Choy. |
2014-03-17 | House | The committees on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Cachola, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Awana, Choy, Takai. |
2014-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU/EDB on Monday, 03-17-14 10:05AM in House conference room 312. |
2014-03-07 | House | Referred to TOU/EDB, FIN, referral sheet 29 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 366) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Galuteria). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2763) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2014-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-14 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Reported from TSM/EGH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2421) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on TSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ige, Ihara. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EGH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom, English, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Chun Oakland, L. Thielen. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on TSM/EGH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-14 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Referred to TSM/EGH, WAM. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |