HI SB3081 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kobayashi, Kong, Luke, Pouha, Rhoads excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kobayashi, Kong, Luke, Pouha, Rhoads excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to establish, administer, and support on-the-job training for individuals who are unemployed and dislocated due to the closure of Hawaiian Commercial & Sugar Company on Maui. (SB3081 HD1)
Title
Hawaiian Commercial & Sugar Company; Dislocated Workers; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kobayashi, Kong, Luke, Pouha, Rhoads excused (6). |
2016-03-22 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1153-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-03-18 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2016-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-18-16 10:00AM in conference room 309. |
2016-03-15 | House | The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-18-16. |
2016-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-15-16 10:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2016-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 338) in amended form (SD 1). |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2798) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-16 1:30PM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2407) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-16 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Referred to JDL/PSM, WAM. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2605 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - Act 071, 06/17/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1172).