HI SB3096 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides an emergency appropriation for the department of education to build an agriculture innovation center. Effective 7/1/2051. (HD2)
Title
Making An Emergency Appropriation To The Department Of Education For An Agriculture Innovation Center.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729). |
2022-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Hashem, Woodson, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Morikawa, Matsumoto. |
2022-04-08 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 742). |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 493). |
2022-04-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, McKelvey, Perruso voting no (3) and Representative(s) Costales, D. Kobayashi, Lowen excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1810-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-04-05 | House | Received from Governor re: Recommended for Immediate Passage (Gov. Msg. No. 17). |
2022-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Perruso; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-03-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-04-22 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-24 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Belatti, Kapela, LoPresti, McKelvey, Tam, Wildberger voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ohno, Quinlan excused (2). |
2022-03-24 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1316-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2022-03-22 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Costales, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Quinlan, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Belatti, Takayama; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Clark, Ohno. |
2022-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 03-22-22 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with Representative(s) Belatti, Wildberger voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McKelvey, Ohno excused (4). |
2022-03-18 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1135-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDN. |
2022-03-16 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Lowen, Todd, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marten, Matayoshi, Matsumoto; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Perruso; and Excused: none. |
2022-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-16-22 10:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to AGR, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 430) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2761) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Reported from EDU/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2262) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 + videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to EDU/AEN, WAM. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2128 (Same As) 2022-01-28 - Referred to AGR, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 3