HI SB312 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB312
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2022 - 75% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McKelvey, Ohno excused (4).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2022 - 75% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McKelvey, Ohno excused (4).
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment to provide that freedom of speech protected under the Hawaii State Constitution does not include the expenditure of money to influence elections. (HD1)
Title
Proposing An Amendment To The Hawaii Constitution Regarding The Freedom Of Speech.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-16 - House - House Government Reform: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McKelvey, Ohno excused (4). |
2022-03-18 | House | Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1138-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2022-03-16 | House | The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Costales, Eli, Ichiyama, Woodson, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno. |
2022-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 03-16-22 9:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to GVR, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-02-14 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Notice of bill proposing constitutional amendment transmitted to Governor pursuant to Article XVII, Section 3 (Sen. Com. No. 1). |
2022-02-11 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 24) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, DeCoite, Fevella, Ihara, Inouye, Kim, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Riviere . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-11-22. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2201) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference (Proposed Draft). |
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB312 (Carry Over) 2021-01-25 - Referred to JDC.