HI SB3120 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the ceiling of the Office of Healthcare Assurance Special Fund to meet expanding program needs and diminish dependence on the general fund. Effective 1/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To The Office Of Healthcare Assurance Special Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 442) in amended form (SD 2). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2895) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2022-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2068) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-22 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to HTH, WAM. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2152 (Same As) 2022-01-28 - Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 3