HI SB3132 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the sunset date of the authorization for primary caregivers to cultivate medical cannabis for their qualifying patients, subject to certain restrictions. Authorizes patient grow sites with more than five patients on land zoned for agricultural use. Requires the Department of Health to adopt administrative rules to conduct routine voluntary grow site inspections without law enforcement. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Medical Cannabis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from HHS/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2562) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey, Richards. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Referred to HHS/CPN, JDC/WAM. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2443 (Same As) 2024-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-24 5:45PM in conference room 325.