HI SB3168 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-28 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-28 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Land and Natural Resources to approve permits for research, education, management, or propagation purposes that include the taking of sand, dead coral, coral rubble, rocks, soil, and other marine deposits seaward of the shoreline. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Taking Of Marine Deposits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | Senate | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-28-24 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2616) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, McKelvey, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 02-14-24 2:00PM; Conference Room 229. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Referred to WTL, JDC. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2479 (Same As) 2024-03-07 - Referred to WTL, JDC.