HI SB3178 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-26 - Referred to LBT, WAM.
Pending: Senate Labor and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-26 - Referred to LBT, WAM.
Pending: Senate Labor and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permanently exempts senior software developers in the Department of Taxation from civil service.
Title
Relating To Tax Administration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-26 | Senate | Referred to LBT, WAM. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2489 (Same As) 2024-06-24 - Act 079, 06/21/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1180).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=3178&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB3178_.HTM |