HI SB3189 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the University of Hawaii Conference Center Revolving Fund and accounts under the fund to facilitate the administration of the revolving fund for conference center programs among various campuses and operating units of the University of Hawaii System. Repeals the Conference Center Revolving Fund for conference center programs conducted by the University of Hawaii at Hilo. (SD1)
Title
Relating To University Of Hawaii Conference Center Revolving Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2508) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Hashimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-24 3:30PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2500 (Same As) 2024-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.