HI SB320 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an iwi reinterment working group to create a process to reinter Native Hawaiian remains in the possession of the State, whose provenience is unknown, or in other special circumstances, on the island of Kahoolawe. (SD1)
Title
Reinterment; Native Hawaiian Remains; Kahoolawe
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2200) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Hee, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Slom. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN deferred the measure until 02-05-14 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-14 1:30PM in conference room 224. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Re-Referred to HWN, WAM. |
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-13 | Senate | The committee on THA deferred the measure. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on THA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-13 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to THA, WAM. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |