HI SB3215 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-12 - The committee on LBT deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Labor and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-12 - The committee on LBT deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Labor and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of employer-sponsored high deductible health plans under certain conditions. Requires maintenance of health savings accounts in conjunction with high deductible health plans. Specifies that employers and insurers that buy or sell high deductible health plans remain subject to the Prepaid Health Care Act. Repeals 06/30/2029.
Title
Relating To Insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Senate | The committee on LBT deferred the measure. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | The committee on HHS deferred the measure. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT/HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Referred to LBT/HHS, CPN/WAM. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=3215&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB3215_.HTM |