HI SB3223 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-22 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-22 10:05AM; Conference Room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-22 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-22 10:05AM; Conference Room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes penalty on both the person and firm upon finding of repeat violations of state law governing wages and hours of employees on public works. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Public Works.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House Labor & Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House Labor & Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-22 10:05AM; Conference Room 224. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-22 10:35AM; Conference Room 224. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729). |
2022-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Onishi, Nakashima Co-Chairs; Sayama, Okimoto. |
2022-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 880). |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2022-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 871). |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 697). |
2022-04-12 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-08 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-22. |
2022-04-08 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1913-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-04-04 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-04-01 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-04-22 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-30 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-04-22. |
2022-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 03-30-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). |
2022-03-24 | House | Reported from LAT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1395-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2022-03-22 | House | The committees on LAT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Sayama, Belatti, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Quinlan, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAT on Tuesday, 03-22-22 9:00AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to LAT, JHA, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 481) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3156) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-03-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2529) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chang. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to LCA, JDC. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2440 (Same As) 2022-03-11 - Referred to LCA, JDC.