HI SB3300 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires county planning commissions, county councils, and designated authorities on coastal zone management to seek to minimize, where reasonable, any risk to development from sea level rise and other coastal hazards. Takes effect 07/01/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Coastal Zone Management.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Reported from WTL/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2261) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, DeCoite, Rhoads, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Richards. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, McKelvey, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-24 1:15PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Re-Referred to WTL/AEN, WAM. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Referred to WTL/AEN/PSM, WAM. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |