HI SB3328 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits commercial ocean use activity at Kaneohe Bay or within 1,000 feet of the bay without a permit from the Department of Land and Natural Resources. Expands commercial ocean use activities requiring a permit to include those involving kayaks, canoes, surfboards, sailboards, dive tours, and fishing tours. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Kaneohe Bay.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] |
Sen. Laura Acasio [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2323) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Re-Referred to WTL, JDC/WAM. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Referred to WTL, JDC. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. |