HI SB3330 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-13 - Act 031, on 06/08/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1131).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-13 - Act 031, on 06/08/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1131).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Land and Natural Resources to establish and conduct the Pupukea Marine Life Conservation District carrying capacity pilot program. Appropriates funds. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The Pupukea Marine Life Conservation District.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Laura Acasio [D] |
Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House Labor & Tourism: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House Labor & Tourism: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-13 | House | Act 031, on 06/08/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1131). |
2022-06-13 | Senate | Act 031, 06/08/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1131). |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824). |
2022-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946). |
2022-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 75-22) as amended in (CD 1). |
2022-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 75-22). |
2022-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Onishi, Branco; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Shimabukuro, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-22 2:30PM; Conference Room 016. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-22 1:30PM; Conference Room 016. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729). |
2022-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas, Onishi, Branco Co-Chairs; McDermott. |
2022-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 873). |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Shimabukuro Co-Chair; Riviere, Fevella. |
2022-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 871). |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 708). |
2022-04-12 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-08 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-22. |
2022-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2009-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-04-05 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Perruso, McDermott. |
2022-04-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-05-22 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Quinlan excused (2). |
2022-03-24 | House | Reported from WAL/LAT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1303-22), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-03-22 | House | The committees on LAT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Sayama, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Quinlan, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Okimoto. |
2022-03-22 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-03-18 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by WAL/LAT on Tuesday, 03-22-22 11:00AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/LAT on Tuesday, 03-22-22 11:00AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to WAL/LAT, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 518) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3177) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-22 10:15AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2075) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1981 (Same As) 2022-01-28 - Referred to WAL/LAT, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Carrying Capacity
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Pilot Program
Pupukea Marine Life Conservation District
Carrying Capacity
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Pilot Program
Pupukea Marine Life Conservation District