HI SB3337 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-28 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-22 5:30PM; Conference Room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-28 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-22 5:30PM; Conference Room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a public policy framework that addresses state goals in the areas of economic disaster mitigation and economic diversification. Appropriates funds to DBEDT to implement specific projects that address those goals. Requires DBEDT to submit annual reports to the legislature summarizing project outcomes. Appropriates funds to staff the Hawaii center for advanced transportation technologies. Effective 10/18/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Economy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-22 5:30PM; Conference Room 325. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-28-22 5:30PM; Conference Room 325. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729). |
2022-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Quinlan, Holt Co-Chairs; B. Kobayashi, Okimoto. |
2022-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 873). |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Kidani, Misalucha Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2022-04-12 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 866). |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 572). |
2022-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1850-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-04-06 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-04-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-06-22 2:45PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Kong excused (2). |
2022-03-23 | House | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1245-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-03-18 | House | The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Belatti, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Friday, 03-18-22 10:30AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 522) in amended form (SD 2). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3124) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2022-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2148) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2409 (Same As) 2022-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
DBEDT
Economic Disaster Mitigation
Economic Diversification
Hawaii Center for Advanced Transportation Technologies
DBEDT
Economic Disaster Mitigation
Economic Diversification
Hawaii Center for Advanced Transportation Technologies