HI SB3356 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Health to approve in-vehicle receipt of medical cannabis and medical cannabis products on or near the premises of dispensaries subject to administrative rules the Department of Health promulgates. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Cannabis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2498) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-11-22 1:30PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-22 1:35PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HTH, JDC. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1578 (Same As) 2022-02-16 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).