HI SB34 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that across-the-board wage increases or reductions and changes in health and retirement benefits for excluded employees in the excluded managerial compensation plan are at least equal to adjustments provided under collective bargaining to employees in the bargaining unit from which the employees in the managerial compensation plan are excluded.
Title
Public Employees; Adjustments
Sponsors
Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 183) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-13 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=34&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB34_.HTM |