HI SB358 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to HLT/HUS, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 30
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to HLT/HUS, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 30
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of health to post on its website reports of all inspections at state-licensed care facilities occurring on 1/1/15, and afterward; provided that any report that includes a violation be removed from the website after three years. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Kupuna Caucus; DOH; Care Facilities; Inspections ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to HLT/HUS, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 118) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 707) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Keith-Agaran. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-27-13 9:15AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-13 10:05AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Reported from HMS/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 106) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Taniguchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 01-31-13 9:45AM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Slom. |
2013-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-13 2:05PM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HMS/HTH, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB120 (Same As) 2013-07-02 - Act 213, 6/27/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1316).