HI SB368 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Hawaii solar loan guarantee program and revolving fund to be administered by the director of business, economic development, and tourism to guarantee loans for solar energy devices and photovoltaic systems. Makes an appropriation for the program subject to program requirements and restrictions.
Title
Hawaii Solar Loan Guarantee Program; Revolving Fund; Program Requirements; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-13 | Senate | The committee on EGH deferred the measure. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH deferred the measure until 02-13-13 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | The committee on ENE deferred the measure. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE/EGH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-13 3:00PM in conference room 225. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to ENE/EGH, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=368&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB368_.HTM |