HI SB368 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB368
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Re-Referred to AEN, WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Re-Referred to AEN, WAM.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the limitation on specific types of wastewater systems to which cesspools must be upgraded or converted, and instead requires a cesspool to be upgraded or converted to a wastewater system approved by the department of health, prior to 1/1/2050.
Title
Relating To Cesspool Conversion.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to HTH/AEN, WAM. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB368 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Re-Referred to AEN, WAM.
HB114 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to EEP/HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB114 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to EEP/HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=368&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB368_.HTM |