HI SB374 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB374
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Technology and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Technology and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the University of Hawaii to collaborate with the Department of Education and the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism to develop and implement an interactive web tool that will enable degree-seeking individuals to make better-informed decisions regarding their post-secondary education and career choices. Appropriates funds to develop web tool.
Title
Relating To Post-secondary Education.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] |
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to TEC/HRE, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB374 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to TEC/HRE, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=374&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB374_.HTM |