HI SB375 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits hydraulic fracturing for oil or gas recovery and the collection, storage, treatment, or discharge of wastewater from hydraulic fracturing without first obtaining a permit from the board of land and natural resources. Establishes procedures for obtaining a permit. Requires the board to adopt rules. Provides for penalties and enforcement.
Title
Conservation; Mining and Materials; Hydraulic Fracturing
Sponsors
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-01-31 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | The committee on ENE deferred the measure. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE/WTL deferred the measure until 01-31-13 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-13 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to ENE/WTL, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB93 (Same As) 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=375&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB375_.HTM |