HI SB375 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the growing of industrial hemp for certain purposes under specified conditions. Appropriates funds for department of agriculture staff to assist in registration of industrial hemp growers and seed testing. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Industrial Hemp; Agriculture; Pilot Program; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to AGR, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 119) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 624) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported from AGL/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 257) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-12-15 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, Riviere, Chun Oakland, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-15 2:46PM in conference room 414. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Re-Referred to AGL/JDL, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to AGL/HEA/JDL, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |