HI SB377 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB377
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that for a third or subsequent moving traffic violation within a one-year period relating to the operation or ownership of a vehicle the person shall be sentenced to perform community service. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Traffic Violations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2686) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, DeCoite, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS deferred the measure until 02-03-22 3:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-22 3:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to TRS, JDC. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB377 (Carry Over) 2021-01-25 - Referred to TRS, JDC.