HI SB42 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB42
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Labor and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Labor and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires employers to provide employees with written notice of the employee's shift schedule at least ten calendar days before the employee is scheduled to work, under certain circumstances. Requires certain employers to pay their employees twice as much as their regular rate of pay for time worked when their shift schedule was not timely given.
Title
Relating To Fair Scheduling.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-30 | Senate | The committee on LBT deferred the measure. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Referred to LBT, JDC/WAM. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2023-01-14 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB42 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - The committee on LBT deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=42&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB42_.HTM |