HI SB421 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB421
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes procedures for the Department of Transportation to assist and enable a person to voluntarily purchase a verified carbon offset for carbon dioxide emissions resulting from the person's air travel to or from an airport in the State. Requires revenue generated from carbon offsets to be directed to the Department of Land and Natural Resources for tree planting or other initiatives that proportionally increase carbon sequestration. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Carbon Offsets.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Reported from TCA/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 331) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) DeCoite, Awa; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Elefante, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-23 1:20PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to TCA/AEN, WAM. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB421 (Carry Over) 2023-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
HB1165 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB1165 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Subjects
Air Travel
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Department of Transportation
Qualified Air Travel
Verified Carbon Offsets
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Department of Transportation
Qualified Air Travel
Verified Carbon Offsets