HI SB462 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB462
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-02 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-02 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the amount of interest in real property that is exempt from attachment and execution. Amends the value of personal property that is exempt from attachment and execution, including increasing the exemption amount for a motor vehicle. Exempts from attachment and execution, an amount equivalent to one month of child support or $5,000, whichever is less, and one month of spousal support or $5,000, whichever is less.
Title
Relating To Attachment And Execution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-26 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2116) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HHS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Keohokalole, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-26-24 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to HHS, JDC/WAM. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB462 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to HHS, JDC/WAM.