HI SB484 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires applicants for category 2 (motorcycle and motor scooter) licenses to designate whether the applicant elects to wear a safety helmet with a chin strap at all times when operating the vehicle. Requires licenses to bear the indication of the election. Clarifies rate and minimum rate of county vehicle weight tax on motorcycles and motor scooters for owners of motorcycles and motor scooters who elect to wear safety helmets shall be discounted by $50. (SD1)
Title
Motorcycle Helmets; Motor Scooter Helmets; License
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported from TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 191) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Espero, Kahele, Kouchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Solomon ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-13 1:17PM in conference room 224. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Re-Referred to TIA, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to TIA/PSM/JDL, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |