HI SB486 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB486
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-01 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-01 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits, in certain circumstances, the publication of the personal information of state and federal judges and other judicial staff whose duties put them at risk for acts of violence or threats.
Title
Relating To The Safety Of Judiciary Personnel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-01 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-23 10:10AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 31) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB486 (Carry Over) 2023-03-01 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
HB386 (Same As) 2023-03-31 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
HB386 (Same As) 2023-03-31 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.