HI SB503 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB503
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health insurance coverage for case management services by qualified mental health providers for victims of sexual violence and abuse. Takes effect on 6/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Victims Of Sexual Violence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-03-15 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 03-16-17 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 182) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 754) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Inouye, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-17 1:35PM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 163) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Espero, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Ihara, Kidani. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-17 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB503 (Carry Over) 2017-03-16 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB665 (Same As) 2017-02-17 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
HB665 (Same As) 2017-02-17 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
Subjects
Case Management Services
Covered Services
Health Insurance
Mental Illness Benefits
Victims of Sexual Violence and Abuse
Covered Services
Health Insurance
Mental Illness Benefits
Victims of Sexual Violence and Abuse